MS HR42 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Leakesville Bearcats Football Team For Winning The 2011 Mississippi Youth Football Association State Championship In The Seven- And Eight-year-olds Division.
Title
Leakesville Bearcats Football Team; congratulate upon winning 2011 MYFA championship title.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-02-21 | Immediate Release | |
2012-02-21 | Adopted | |
2012-02-20 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-02-17 | Referred To Rules |