MS HR40 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Jones County Junior College Baseball Team On Their Outstanding Season And Their Trip To The Njcaa Division Ii World Series.
Title
Jones County Junior College Bobcats Baseball Team; commend and congratulate on outstanding season.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-02-21 | Immediate Release | |
2012-02-21 | Adopted | |
2012-02-20 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-02-17 | Referred To Rules |