MS HR36 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Gulfport High School Lady Admirals Soccer Team, Head Coach Chris Pryor And Assistant Coaches Haley Hammons, Courtney Ladner And Judy Riley For Their Outstanding 2020-2021 Season And Earning The Title As Back-to-back Champions After Winning The Mississippi High School Activities Association Class 6a Girls Soccer State Championship For The Second Year In A Row.
Title
Gulfport High School Lady Admirals Soccer Team; commend for winning back-to-back championships in the Class 6A Soccer State Championship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-10 | House | Immediate Release |
2021-03-10 | House | Adopted |
2021-03-08 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred To Rules |