MS HR33 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending The Distinguished Career And Exceptional Public Service Of Mrs. Carolyn Chase Bailes Rendered To The State Of Mississippi Through Her Esteemed Employment With The Mississippi House Of Representatives Upon The Occasion Of Her Retirement.
Title
Carolyn Chase Bailes; commend distinguished career and exceptional public service upon the occasion of her retirement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-02-23 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-02-23 | House | Adopted |
2015-02-19 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred To Rules |