MS HR26 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commemorating The Links, Incorporated, On The Observance Of The "mississippi Links Day At The Capitol 2020" For Their Outstanding Service To The Community.
Title
"Mississippi Links Day at the Capitol 2020"; honor as "Agents of Change, Advocates of Action."
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Gibbs [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-02-19 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-02-19 | House | Adopted |
2020-02-18 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-02-17 | House | Referred To Rules |