MS HR25 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-09 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-09 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Urging Mississippi's Businesses And Industries To Help Protect The Health, Well-being And Investment Made In The State's Workforce By Implementing Ergonomic Practices And Programs Proven To Prevent And Relieve Musculoskeletal Disorders.
Title
Mississippi businesses; urge to implement ergonomic practices to protect the health of the state's workforce.
Sponsors
Rep. James Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-02-08 | Immediate Release | |
2012-02-08 | Adopted | |
2012-02-03 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-01-31 | Referred To Rules |