MS HR23 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending Legendary And Renowned Musician Mr. Rickey Medlocke For His Musical Artistry As A Member Of Celebrated Rock Bands Lynyrd Skynyrd And Blackfoot.
Title
Rickey Medlocke; commend musical success and becoming a bona fide resident of Mississippi.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Hale [R] | Rep. Lester Carpenter [R] | Rep. Dale Goodin [R] | Rep. Bill Kinkade [R] |
Rep. Joseph Tubb [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-02-16 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-02-16 | House | Adopted |
2022-02-15 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-02-09 | House | Referred To Rules |