MS HR21 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Mourning The Loss And Commemorating The Life And Legacy Of Dr. Josephine Posey.
Title
Dr. Josephine Posey; commend life and legacy upon passing of.
Sponsors
Rep. Oscar Denton [D] | Rep. Jeffery Harness [D] | Rep. Alyce Clarke [D] | Rep. Gregory Holloway [D] |
Rep. Orlando Paden [D] | Rep. Karl Gibbs [D] | Rep. Rickey Thompson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-02-19 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-02-19 | House | Adopted |
2020-02-18 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred To Rules |