MS HR120 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating The 2023 Killebrew Memorial Rodeo Upon Being Named The 2023 Best New Rodeo And The 2023 Best Indoor Rodeo By The International Pro Rodeo Association.
Title
2023 Keath Killebrew Memorial Rodeo; commend upon winning awards from the International Pro Rodeo Association.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Boyd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-15 | House | Adopted |
2024-04-11 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-04-10 | House | Referred To Rules |