MS HR119 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating Jordan O'neal, Upon Being Named The 2024 Swac Defensive Player Of The Year.
Title
Jordan O'Neal; commend upon being named 2024 SWAC Defensive Player of the Year.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-15 | House | Adopted |
2024-04-11 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-04-10 | House | Referred To Rules |