MS HR109 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating Dr. Jim Futral, Upon His Retirement From The Mississippi Baptist Convention Board After 21 Years Of Devoted Service As The Executive Director-treasurer.
Title
Dr. Jim Futral; commend and congratulate upon retirement as Executive Director-Treasurer of the Mississippi Baptist Convention Board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-21 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-03-21 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-20 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-19 | House | Referred To Rules |