MS HR10 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-16 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-16 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Resolution Commending And Congratulating Ms. Jade Dedeaux Upon Being Selected As Queen Illinois 2013 During The Original Illinois' Club Inc.'s 112th Annual Ball And Debutante Cotillion.
Title
Jade Dedeaux; commend and congratulate upon being named Queen Illinois for 2013.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-16 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-01-15 | House | Immediate Release |
2013-01-15 | House | Adopted |
2013-01-14 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-01-11 | House | Referred To Rules |