MS HC98 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Bassfield High School Yellowjackets Football Team And Head Coach Lance Mancuso Upon A Remarkable Season And Winning The Mississippi High School Activities Association Class 2a State Championship.
Title
Bassfield High School Yellowjackets Football Team; commend on winning Class 2A State Championship.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Warren [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-23 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-23 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-21 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-04-21 | Immediate Release | |
2010-04-21 | Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | Referred To Rules | |
2010-03-24 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-03-24 | Immediate Release | |
2010-03-24 | Adopted | |
2010-03-17 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-03-16 | Referred To Rules |