MS HC91 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Distinguished Career And Meritorious Leadership And Service That Gary T. Hargrove Provided As The Harrison County Coroner Upon The Occasion Of His Retirement.
Title
Gary T. Hargrove; commend his service as Harrison County Coroner upon the occasion of his retirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2019-03-20 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-03-20 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-03-20 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-19 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred To Rules |