MS HC85 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Career Of Dr. William A. Lewis And Congratulating Him Upon The Occasion Of His Retirement.
Title
Dr. William A. Lewis; commend career upon the occasion of his retirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2017-03-15 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | Immediate Release |
2017-03-15 | House | Adopted |
2017-03-14 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-03-08 | House | Referred To Rules |