MS HC59 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Forest High School Bearcats Football Team And Head Coach Judd Boswell For Their Outstanding 2010 Season And For Winning The Mhsaa Class 3a State Championship.
Title
Forest High School Bearcats Football Team; commend upon winning its fourth MHSAA Class-3A State Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-01 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-02-24 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-24 | Immediate Release | |
2011-02-24 | Adopted | |
2011-02-24 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-02-23 | Referred To Rules | |
2011-02-22 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-22 | Immediate Release | |
2011-02-22 | Adopted | |
2011-02-21 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-02-15 | Referred To Rules |