MS HC51 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-09 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-09 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Pearl High School Pirate Marching Band Under The Direction Of Jeff Cannon Upon Winning The Mississippi High School Activities Association And Mississippi Band Association 2009 Class 5a State Championship.
Title
Pearl High School Pirate Band; commend on winning 2009 Class 5A State Band Championship.
Sponsors
Rep. Ray Rogers [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-05 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-09 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-02-09 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-02-05 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-05 | Immediate Release | |
2010-02-05 | Adopted | |
2010-02-04 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-01-27 | Referred To Rules | |
2010-01-27 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-01-27 | Immediate Release | |
2010-01-27 | Adopted | |
2010-01-26 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-01-26 | Referred To Rules |