MS HC24 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-23 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The South Panola High School Tigers Football Team For Their Outstanding 2012 Season And For Winning The Mississippi High School Activities Association Class 6a State Championship.
Title
South Panola Tigers Football Team; commend and congratulate upon winning 2012 MHSAA Class 6A State Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-17 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-15 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-01-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Adopted |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2013-01-15 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-01-15 | House | Immediate Release |
2013-01-15 | House | Adopted |
2013-01-14 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-01-11 | House | Referred To Rules |