MS HC21 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing And Commending The Town Of Terry, Mississippi, Upon The Occasion Of Its 150th Anniversary, And Expressing Sincere Wishes For Continued Success And Prosperity In The Future.
Title
Town of Terry; recognize upon 150th anniversary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-18 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-01-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2017-01-19 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-01-18 | House | Adopted |
2017-01-17 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-16 | House | Referred To Rules |