MS HC142 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending Entergy Corporation And The Employees And Management Of Grand Gulf Nuclear Station For 25 Years Of Commitment To Providing Clean, Reliable And Affordable Energy To Mississippi.
Title
Grand Gulf Nuclear Station; commend for 25 years of clean, reliable and affordable energy to Mississippi.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-29 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-22 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-04-22 | Immediate Release | |
2010-04-22 | Adopted | |
2010-04-22 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Referred To Rules | |
2010-04-21 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-04-21 | Immediate Release | |
2010-04-21 | Adopted | |
2010-04-20 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2010-04-20 | Referred To Rules |