MS HB955 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Establish A Procedure For The Disposition Of Abandoned Manufactured Or Mobile Homes And Associated Personal Property; To Provide Definitions; To Provide For A Complaint For Disposition Of Abandoned Manufactured Or Mobile Homes; To Provide For The Entry Of An Order By The Court Naming A Commissioner To Handle The Disposition And Setting The Date And Time Of The Sale; To Provide For Advertisement And Procedures For The Sale; To Provide For Payment Of Debt And Exercise Of Possession; To Provide For Disbursement Of Bid Amount By The Commissioner; To Provide For Entry Of A Final Order And Submission Of The Bill Of Sale To The Mississippi Department Of Revenue; To Provide That This Proceeding Is A Good Faith Defense Of The Owner Of Real Property To Claims Of Wrongful Sale; To Amend Section 19-3-85, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Abandoned mobile homes; establish a procedure to dispose of.
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Yancey [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2021-02-04 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-03 | House | Passed |
2021-01-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |