MS HB942 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Mississippi Department Of Wildlife, Fisheries And Parks To Allow An Online Applicant For A Resident Hunting Or Fishing License To Indicate If The Applicant Desires To Be A Donor Of An Anatomical Gift; To Require The Hunting Or Fishing License Of An Online Applicant Who Elects To Be A Donor To Include A Symbol Indicating That The License Holder Is A Donor Under The Mississippi Uniform Anatomical Gift Act; To Amend Section 41-39-103, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define The Term "hunting Or Fishing License" As Used Under The Anatomical Gift Act; To Amend Section 41-39-107, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Include Persons Applying Online For A Hunting Or Fishing License Who Are Over The Age Of 18 In The List Of Persons Eligible To Make An Anatomical Gift; To Amend Sections 41-39-109 And 41-39-127, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity To The Preceding Provisions; To Amend Section 41-39-139, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Department To Provide Relevant Information Regarding A Donor's Anatomical Gift To A Donor Registry Established Or Contracted For By The Mississippi Department Of Public Safety; To Require An Online Application For The Renewal Of A Hunting Or Fishing License To Include A Question Asking The Applicant If The Individual Desires To Be A Donor; To Direct The Code Publishers To Codify Section 1 Of This Act With The Laws Governing Hunting And Fishing In Chapter 7, Title 49, Mississippi Code Of 1972; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Hunting and fishing; allow online applicants for a license to elect to be an organ donor.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Kinkade [R] | Rep. Jill Ford [R] | Rep. Jeff Hale [R] | Rep. Ken Morgan [R] |
Rep. Bill Pigott [R] | Rep. Brent Powell [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Died In Conference |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Conferees Named Whaley,Suber,Younger |
2022-03-16 | House | Conferees Named Kinkade,Barnett,Hale |
2022-03-14 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Amended |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks |
2022-01-26 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-01-25 | House | Passed |
2022-01-20 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 39 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 39 | 109 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 39 | 127 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 39 | 139 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |