MS HB941 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-08 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-08 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Bring Forward Sections 27-103-125, 27-103-139, 27-103-203, 27-103-211, 27-103-213, 27-103-301, 43-13-407 And 65-37-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relate To Various Aspects Of The Budget Process, For The Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Amend Section 27-103-303, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Maximum Amounts That May Be Transferred From The Capital Expense Fund To The Bureau Of Building, Grounds And Real Property Management For A Single Emergency And For All Emergencies During Any Fiscal Year; To Bring Forward Sections 41-113-3 And 41-113-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Create The Office Of Tobacco Control In The State Department Of Health And Provide For Its Duties, For The Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Amend Section 41-113-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Any Funds Appropriated From The Tobacco Control Program Fund That Are Unexpended At The End Of Fiscal Year 2017 Shall Lapse Into Health Care Expendable Fund; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Budget process; bring forward various sections relating to.
Sponsors
Rep. John Read [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2017-02-02 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-02-01 | House | Passed |
2017-01-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-01-16 | House | Referred To Appropriations |