MS HB934 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-65-111, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exempt From Sales Taxation Sales Of Tangible Personal Property And Services To The Junior League Of Jackson, Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Sales tax; exempt sales of tangible personal property and services to the Junior League of Jackson, Mississippi.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2019-02-27 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | Passed |
2019-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-21 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |