MS HB927 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-31-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Expand Funding Sources For Full-time Legal Assistants And Criminal Investigators For District Attorneys; And For Related Purposes.
Title
District attorneys; revise funding source for legal assistants and criminal investigators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Died In Committee | |
2010-02-15 | Referred To Fees, Salaries and Administration;Appropriations | |
2010-02-11 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-09 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-02-09 | Amended | |
2010-02-02 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-02 | DR - TSDPAA: AP To JA | |
2010-01-29 | DR - TSDP: JA To AP | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Judiciary A;Appropriations |