MS HB906 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Provide For The Licensure Of Professional Music Therapists By The State Department Of Health; To Provide For Definitions; To Provide For The Establishment, Appointment And Membership Of The Music Therapy Advisory Committee; To Direct The Department To Seek The Advice Of The Advisory Committee For Issues Related To Music Therapy; To Provide The Powers And Duties Of The Advisory Committee; To Provide That Beginning On January 1, 2025, No Person Without A License As A Professional Music Therapist Shall Practice Music Therapy Or Use Any Title That Implies That The Person Is A Professional Music Therapist; To Prescribe Certain Requirements For Professional Music Therapists In The Provision Of Music Therapy Services; To Provide For Licensure Application And Qualifications For Licensure; To Provide For License Renewal; To Provide For Disciplinary Actions Against Licensees; To Direct The State Board Of Health To Set Certain Fees; To Create A Special Fund In The State Treasury; To Require That All Fees Collected By The Department Under This Act Shall Be Deposited Into The Special Fund; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Professional music therapists; provide for licensure by State Department of Health.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Byrd [R] | Rep. Sam Creekmore [R] | Rep. Kevin Felsher [R] | Rep. Bill Kinkade [R] |
Rep. Dana Underwood McLean [R] | Rep. Ken Morgan [R] | Rep. Donnie Scoggin [R] | Rep. Joseph Tubb [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 105 N: 8 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare;Appropriations |
2024-03-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Passed As Amended |
2024-03-07 | House | Amended |
2024-03-07 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2024-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2024-02-02 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |