MS HB873 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-15-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit The State And School Employees Health Insurance Management Board From Imposing A Premium Surcharge Or Any Other Premium Differential Upon Any Class Of Participant Of The Health Insurance Plan Based On The Use Or Nonuse Of Tobacco-related Products; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State Health Insurance Management Board; prohibit from imposing premium surcharge based on use of tobacco products.
Sponsors
Rep. John Moore [R] | Rep. Omeria Scott [D] | Rep. John Hines [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-03-17 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-12 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Amended |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Insurance |
2015-02-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-02-12 | House | Passed |
2015-02-12 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2015-02-11 | House | Read the Third Time |
2015-01-29 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2015-01-29 | House | DR - TSDPCS: AP To IN |
2015-01-27 | House | DR - TSDPCS: IN To AP |
2015-01-19 | House | Referred To Insurance;Appropriations |