MS HB871 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Be Known As The Public Pension Notification Act; To Require Certain Public Retirement Systems To Disclose Certain Information To The Public And Provide Certain Information To Participants; To Provide That The Act Applies To All Public Retirement Programs And Retirement Systems, With Certain Exceptions; To Require The Administrator Of A Retirement System To Disseminate To The Public A Summary Plan Description, Annual Disclosure Of Financial And Actuarial Status, And An Annual Report; To Require The Administrator Of A Retirement System To Furnish To Each Participant And Beneficiary Who Is Receiving Benefits Under A Retirement Program Certain Information About The Program; To Require The Administrator Of A Retirement System To File Certain Information With The Retirement System; To Authorize Enforcement Of The Provisions Of This Act By An Action Maintained By A Public Employer Or By A Participant Or Beneficiary; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Public retirement systems, certain; require to disclose certain information to public and participants.
Sponsors
Rep. Henry Zuber [R] | Rep. Manly Barton [R] | Rep. Charles Busby [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Guice [R] |
Rep. John Read [R] | Rep. Jeramey Anderson [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-01-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2015-01-28 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-01-28 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-01-28 | House | Passed |
2015-01-28 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2015-01-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2015-01-19 | House | Referred To Banking and Financial Services |