MS HB866 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 27-55-7, 27-55-507, 27-57-7 And 27-59-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow The Maximum Bond Limit For Distributors Of Gasoline, Special Fuel, Lubricating Oil And Compressed Gas To Be Exceeded In Certain Circumstances; To Amend Sections 27-57-5, 27-57-9, 27-57-11 And 27-57-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove All References To Class A And Class B Lubricating Oil Distributors; To Amend Sections 27-55-13, 27-55-523, 27-59-13 And 27-59-311, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove References To Filing Paper Returns And To Add Requirements For Electronic Filing; To Amend Section 27-57-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity To The Above; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Fuel and lubricating oil taxes; remove bond limit and class distinctions for certain distributors, require electronic filing of returns.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lamar [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 109 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 109 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Passed |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2020-03-12 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-03-10 | House | Amended |
2020-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |