MS HB853 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-28-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Deadline By Which The Mississippi Charter School Authorizer Board Is Required To Publish A Pamphlet Of Statutory And Regulatory Updates To Charter Schools From July 1 To October 1; To Amend Section 37-28-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Date By Which The Authorizer Board Is Required To Publicize Requests For Proposals By A Specified Date, To Simply Require An Annual Publication For Such Requests; To Amend Section 37-28-37, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Deadline By Which The Authorizer Board Must Submit Its Annual Legislative Report From October 1 To December 1; To Revise The Timeline That Peer Is Required To Submit An Evaluative Report From Annually To Even-numbered Years; To Amend Section 37-28-55, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That In Its Initial Year Of Operation A Charter School Shall Receive One Gifted Teacher Unit And One Special Education Teacher Unit; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Charter schools; revise deadlines for certain reporting requirements and to allow certain teacher units to those in first year of operation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 86 N: 25 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Education;Appropriations |
2021-02-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-10 | House | Passed |
2021-01-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Education |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 28 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 28 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 28 | 37 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 28 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |