MS HB846 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-7-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform The Fees Charged By Chancery Clerks For Filing And Recording Deeds To Land Sold For Taxes And For Recording Redemption Of Lands Sold For Taxes To Those Fees Set In Section 25-7-9(1)(b); And For Related Purposes.
Title
Chancery clerk fees; conform recording deeds to land sold for taxes and redemption of such lands.
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Yancey [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 18 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 18 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Passed |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2024-03-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Passed |
2024-03-07 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2024-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2024-02-02 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |