MS HB758 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Conferees Named Barnett,Thomas,Kirby
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Conferees Named Barnett,Thomas,Kirby
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 47-5-579, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of The Repealer On The Central Mississippi Correctional Facility Pilot Work Initiative Under Which Certain Inmates May Be Allowed To Participate In Work, Educational And Rehabilitative Programs While Serving Their Sentence; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Pilot Work Initiative at Central MS Correctional Facility; extend repealer on.
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Shanks [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Conferees Named Barnett,Thomas,Kirby |
2024-04-16 | House | Conferees Named Currie,Horan,Rushing |
2024-04-15 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Amended |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Referred To Corrections |
2024-03-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Passed |
2024-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-01-29 | House | Referred To Corrections |