MS HB758 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-08 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-08 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 49-7-95, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit The Use Of Any Thermal Imaging Or Heat Amplifying Device When Hunting, Taking Or Killing Deer At Night; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Thermal imaging or heat amplifying device; prohibit use of when hunting, taking or killing deer at night.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Died On Calendar |
2018-02-01 | House | Tabled Subject To Call |
2018-01-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-11 | House | Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks |
Mississippi State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2018/pdf/history/HB/HB0758.xml |
Text | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2018/html/HB/0700-0799/HB0758IN.htm |