MS HB758 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 41-7-191, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Direct The State Department Of Health To Issue A Certificate Of Need To The Alexander Milne Home For Women, Inc., For Not Exceeding 45 Icf-mr Beds In Laurel, Under The Condition That The State Portion Of The Medicaid Match Be Paid By The Recipient Of The Certificate Of Need; To Amend Section 43-13-117, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Division Of Medicaid To Make Full Reimbursement To Any Intermediate Care Facility For The Mentally Retarded That Is A Nonprofit 501(c)(3) Corporation Paying The State's Portion Of The Medicaid Match; And For Related Purposes.
Title
CON; issue to Alexander Milne Home for Women for ICF-MR beds in Laurel.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-02 | Died In Committee | |
2010-01-26 | DR - TSDPCS: PH To AP | |
2010-01-14 | Rereferred To Public Health and Human Services;Appropriations | |
2010-01-13 | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |
Mississippi State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2010/pdf/history/HB/HB0758.xml |
Text | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2010/html/HB/0700-0799/HB0758IN.htm |