MS HB740 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create A New Section Of Law To Require The Commissioner Of Public Safety To Establish An Alternative State Identification Card That Does Not Require Proof Of Domicile, For The Purpose Of Making A State Identification Card Available For Persons Who Do Not Have A Domicile To List; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State identification card; require commissioner of DPS to establish one that does not require proof of domicile.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2021-03-01 | Senate | DR - TSDP: HI To AC |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2021-02-04 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-03 | House | Passed |
2021-02-03 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2021-01-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Transportation |