MS HB688 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Sections 37-17-6, 37-179-1 And 37-179-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The State Department Of Education To Acknowledge Student Performance In Schools Within Districts Of Innovation That Administer The Cambridge Assessment Or Other Nationally Recognized Assessment To Determine Student Proficiency For The Purpose Of Assigning School And District Accountability Ratings; To Require The Department To Develop A Procedure For The Acceptance Of The Cambridge Assessment Or Other Nationally Recognized Assessments Used By School Within Districts Of Innovation In Lieu Of The Maap Assessments And Subject Area Testing Program; To Require The Department To Assign Accountability Designations To Schools Within Districts Of Innovation Based Upon Student Performance On The Selected Nationally Recognized Assessment Administered By The School, In Comparison To The Student Performance Cut Scores Used For Each Accountability Designation On The Statewide Assessment System; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Districts of Innovations; require SDE to recognize use of Cambridge Assessment or other nationally recognized assessment for purposes of school accountability designations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 107 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateDied In Committee
2019-02-25SenateReferred To Education
2019-02-14HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-12HousePassed As Amended
2019-02-12HouseAmended
2019-02-12HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-01-31HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-17HouseReferred To Education

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback