MS HB626 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 19-11-27, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Any County To Expend Or Contract An Obligation Against Certain Funds In The Last Six Months Of Their Term Office If A County Has Projects Or A Project Funded By The American Rescue Plan Act (arpa) So That Such County May Work Towards Completing Such Projects Or Project To Meet The Year 2026 Federal Arpa Spending Deadline; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Boards of Supervisors; provide exception on prohibition of expending certain funds in last months of office to meet federal ARPA spending deadline.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Byrd [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 106 N: 6 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Referred To County Affairs |
2023-02-01 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2023-02-01 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2023-01-25 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Arnold, Byrd, Taylor) |
2023-01-25 | House | Passed |
2023-01-19 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred To County Affairs |