MS HB557 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 99-15-26, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Successful Completion Of Workforce Training At A Community College Or Workforce Development Center Or A Similar Training Or Diversion Program Administered By A Nonprofit Or Other Entity As A Condition Of The Court's Authority To Withhold Acceptance Of A Person's Plea And Sentence Under The Nonadjudication Provisions Of This Section; To Amend Section 99-15-117, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Successful Completion Of Workforce Training At A Community College Or Workforce Development Center As A Term Of The Pretrial Intervention Program Under This Section; To Require The Department Of Finance And Administration To Transfer From The Budget Of The Mississippi Department Of Corrections To The Mississippi Community College Board The Sum Of $2,000.00 For Each Person Who Successfully Completes Workforce Training At A Community College Or Workforce Development Center As A Condition Of The Court Withholding Acceptance Of The Person's Plea And Sentence Under Section 99-15-26 Or As A Term Of The Pretrial Intervention Program Under Section 99-15-117, Which Shall Be Disbursed To The Community College At Which The Person Received The Workforce Training Or The Community College Affiliated With The Workforce Development Center At Which The Person Received The Workforce Training; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Nonadjudication; authorize completion of workforce training or similar training as an option for.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | DR - TSDPAA: CR To EC |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Corrections;Economic and Workforce Development |
2021-02-05 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-04 | House | Passed |
2021-01-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Corrections |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
99 | 15 | 117 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
99 | 15 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |