MS HB551 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Enact The "empowering Reentry Through Licensing Act" Which Provides For A Six-month Provisional Driver's License Issued By The Department Of Public Safety To Eligible Persons Who Have Been Released From Incarceration; To Define Terms; To Authorize Provisional Licenses; To Provide Certain Requirements And Certain Disqualifications For Eligibility; To Require Certain Duties Of The Department Of Public Safety To Administer The Act; To Direct The Mississippi Department Of Corrections To Identify Eligible Persons To Apply For A Provisional Driver's License; To Amend Sections 47-5-157 And 47-7-33.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Driver's license; require Department of Public Safety to allow official identifying document of MDOC to suffice for.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-16 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Amended |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2021-02-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2021-02-09 | House | Amended |
2021-01-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 5 | 157 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 7 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |