MS HB544 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 11 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - Due From Governor 04/17/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 11 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - Due From Governor 04/17/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-39-332, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Authorizes Counties To Levy Millage For The Construction And Operation Of The Burn Center Lodge For Families Of Victims Being Treated At The Burn Unit At Crossgates River Oaks Hospital, To Change The Name Of The Organization To Which The Proceeds Of The Millage Are Provided From The Mississippi Firefighters Memorial Burn Association To The Current Name Of The Mississippi Burn Foundation; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Burn Center Lodge; update name of organization receiving tax to support it to the current name of MS Burn Foundation.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Due From Governor 04/17/12 | |
2012-04-11 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-11 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-05 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-04-04 | Passed | |
2012-03-29 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-03-19 | Referred To Finance | |
2012-03-14 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-03-14 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2012-03-12 | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Flaggs, Frierson, Huddleston (15th)) | |
2012-03-12 | Passed | |
2012-03-06 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-02-13 | Referred To Appropriations |