MS HB529 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Designate A Segment Of Mississippi Highway 15 In Newton And Neshoba County, Mississippi, Within The City Of Union As The "judge Marcus D. Gordon Memorial Highway"; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Memorial highway; designate certain segment of MS Highway 15 in Newton and Neshoba counties as "Judge Marcus D. Gordon Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Rep. Randal Rushing [R] | Rep. Scott Bounds [R] | Rep. Timmy Ladner [R] | Rep. Troy Smith [R] |
Rep. Tom Miles [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |
2020-03-06 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed |
2020-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-27 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To TR |
2020-02-20 | House | DR - TSDP: TR To AP |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred To Transportation;Appropriations |