MS HB509 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 71-5-506, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow Withholding From Unemployment Compensation For State Income Taxes; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Unemployment compensation; allow withholding of state income tax.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lamar [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 106 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 106 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Passed |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2021-02-04 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-04 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2021-02-03 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Hines, Lamar, Steverson) |
2021-02-03 | House | Passed |
2021-01-19 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |