MS HB507 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-13-171, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Each Local School Board To Adopt A Sex-related Education Policy To Implement Abstinence-only Or Abstinence-plus Education Into Its Local School District's Curriculum By June 30, 2012, Or To Require The Local School Board To Adopt The Program Developed By The Mississippi Department Of Human Services And The Department Of Health; To Require The State Department To Approve Each District's Curriculum For Sex-related Education And Establish A Protocol To Be Used By Districts To Provide Continuity In Teaching The Approved Curriculum; To Provide That Instruction In School Districts Implementing Abstinence-plus Education Into The Curriculum May Be Expanded Beyond The Instruction For Abstinence-only Education Within Parameters Approved By The Department; To Define Abstinence-plus Education; To Remove The Authority Given To Local School Boards To Vote In Favor Of Teaching Sex Education Without Any Instruction On Abstinence; To Prohibit Any Teaching That Abortion Can Be Used To Prevent The Birth Of A Baby; To Require Boys And Girls To Be Separated Into Different Classes By Gender At All Times When Sex-related Education Is Discussed Or Taught; To Require The Department Of Human Services And The Department Of Health To Develop Certain Programs And Strategies Promoting Pregnancy Prevention And Providing Information On The Consequences Of Unprotected, Uninformed And Underage Sexual Activity; To Provide For The Repeal Of This Section On July 1, 2016; To Amend Section 37-13-173, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That No Student Shall Be Required To Take Or Participate In Any Class Or Course In Sex-related Education Unless The Student's Parent Or Guardian Submits A Written Request To That Participation; To Require The State Board Of Education To Maintain Certain Standards In The Social Studies Curriculum Used In The Public Schools And To Prohibit History Courses From Being Revised For Partisan Or Philosophical Purposes; To Amend Section 2, Chapter 507, Laws Of 2009, To Revise The Duties Of The Teen Pregnancy Task Force And To Extend The Date Of The Repeal On The Task Force To July 1, 2016; To Require The State Department Of Health And The State Department Of Education, Subject To The Availability Of Funds, To Establish A Pilot Program In Each Health Care District, To Be Located In A School District In A County Having The Highest Number Of Teen Pregnancies; To Require Those Agencies To Provide Certain Educational Services Through Qualified Personnel; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Sex education; require local school board to adopt a policy to implement abstinence-only or abstinence-plus education into curriculum.
Sponsors
Rep. Alyce Clarke [D] | Rep. Brad Mayo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-01 | Died In Committee | |
2011-01-10 | Referred To Education |
Mississippi State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2011/pdf/history/HB/HB0507.xml |
Text | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2011/html/HB/0500-0599/HB0507IN.htm |