MS HB454 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 63-3-519, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Use Of Radar Speed Detection Equipment By Municipal Law Enforcement Officers In Any Municipality Where The County Seat Is Located In The Municipality And Where There Is Located A Public Community College In Such Municipality; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Radar; authorize use by municipal law enforcement officers in certain municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 70 N: 40 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 70 N: 40 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Passed |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |
2023-02-10 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2023-02-09 | House | Passed |
2023-01-30 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |