MS HB453 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Referred To Judiciary, Division B
Pending: Senate Judiciary, Division B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create Section 17-25-11.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow A Certified Law Enforcement Officer Or Certified Part-time Law Enforcement Officer, Who Is Employed By A County Or Municipality, To Use His Or Her Official Uniform, Weapon And Vehicle While Performing Volunteer Services For A Church, Community Club, Social Event Or Other Community Event In Off-duty Hours; To Amend Section 45-9-131, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Members Of Certain Law Enforcement Agencies To Retain His Or Her Sidearm Upon Retirement; To Bring Forward Section 17-25-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Allows A Certified Law Enforcement Officer Or Certified Part-time Law Enforcement Officer, Who Is Employed By A County Or Municipality, To Use His Or Her Official Uniform And Weapon While Performing Private Security Services In Off-duty Hours; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law enforcement officers; allow off-duty use of official vehicles while performing certain volunteer services in off-duty hours.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 82 N: 32 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division B
2021-02-05HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-04HousePassed
2021-01-27HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-01-18HouseReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
172511New CodeSee Bill Text
459131Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback