MS HB413 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize A Court To Award Reimbursement Or Payment Of Actual Expenses Incurred As A Result Of Injuries Caused By A Dog Bite; To Amend Section 97-41-16, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides For The Dog And Cat Protection Law To Conform To The Preceding Section; To Bring Forward Section 97-41-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Authorizes Law Enforcement To Kill Neglected Dogs, For Purposes Of Amendment Which Authorizes; To Bring Forward Section 95-5-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Allows An Owner Of Poultry To Kill A Dog That Has Harmed Its Poultry Or Livestock, For Purposes Of Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 41-53-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Authorizes Any Sheriff To Kill A Dog That Is Running At Large, For Purposes Of Amendment; To Bring Forward Sections 21-19-9 And 19-5-50, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Authorize Municipalities To Regulate Animals Running At Large, For Purposes Of Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Dog bites; authorize payment for actual expenses for injuries caused by.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 95 N: 18 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2024-03-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-06 | House | Passed As Amended |
2024-03-06 | House | Amended |
2024-02-29 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-01-22 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 5 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 19 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 53 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
95 | 5 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
97 | 41 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
97 | 41 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |