MS HB4125 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-27 - Title Suff Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-27 - Title Suff Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Union County, Mississippi, To Levy An Assessment, In Addition To Any Other Assessments And Court Costs, For Civil Cases Filed And Misdemeanor Convictions And/or Nonadjudications Obtained In Its Justice Court, To Be Placed In A Special County Fund Designated The "union County Capital Improvements Fund" And Used To Fund Capital Improvements; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Union County; authorize assessments on misdemeanor convictions and nonadjudications for capital improvements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-04-27 | Senate | DR - TSDP: LP To FI |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private;Finance |
2024-04-23 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-04-23 | House | Immediate Release |
2024-04-23 | House | Passed |
2024-04-23 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2024-04-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2024-04-17 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |