MS HB4123 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-27 - Referred To Judiciary, Division B
Pending: Senate Judiciary, Division B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-27 - Referred To Judiciary, Division B
Pending: Senate Judiciary, Division B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Restore The Right Of Suffrage To Scotty Adam Mcmahan Of Covington County, Mississippi; To Restore The Right Of Suffrage To Michael Gray Of Prentiss County, Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Suffrage; restore to Scotty Adam McMahan of Covington County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-26 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 30 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-27 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2024-04-27 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-04-26 | House | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-26 | House | Amended |
2024-04-26 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2024-04-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2024-04-11 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |