MS HB354 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 21-23-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That A Municipal Judge Shall Have The Power To Order A Defendant To Remedy A Real Property Municipal Ordinance Violation Within A Reasonable Time Period Prescribed By The Judge; To Provide That A Municipal Judge May Authorize The Municipality, Upon Its Request, To Remedy The Violation Through The Use Of Municipal Employees Or Contractors If Such Defendant Fails To Remedy The Violation; To Provide That If A Municipality Remedies A Violation Due To A Defendant's Failure To Do So, The Municipality May Petition The Court To Assess Certain Cleanup Costs To The Defendant And After A Hearing Concerning The Assessment Of Such Costs, The Court May Assess The Costs To The Defendant As A Judgement; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Municipal judges; authorize to order a defendant to remedy real property ordinance violations within a reasonable time period.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Passed |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2021-02-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-10 | House | Passed |
2021-02-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |