MS HB319 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 45-9-101, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Waive The Residency Requirement For Spouses Of Active Military Personnel For Gun Permits; To Amend Section 63-11-25, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require That The Petition To Review A Forfeiture, Suspension Or Denial Of The Issuance Of A Driver's License Be Served Upon The Commissioner Of Public Safety; And For Related Purposes.
Title
DPS; make revision to gun permit residency requirement and certain driver's license petitions for review.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2021-02-05 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-04 | House | Passed As Amended |
2021-02-04 | House | Amended |
2021-02-04 | House | Reconsidered |
2021-02-03 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Busby, Massengill) |
2021-02-03 | House | Passed |
2021-01-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Transportation |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 9 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 11 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |